Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transfer Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223 /CH0138
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620 /CH0294
Title
County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948 /CH0316
Title
Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0315
Title
Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0223 /CH0138 Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 /CH0294 County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - Extensions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0948 /CH0316 Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0315 Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM