Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Transfer Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 /CH0342
Title
Montgomery County - Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Alterations MC 7-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB1013)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454 /CH0477
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1609
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013 (HB1149)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061
Title
St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0848 /CH0342 Montgomery County - Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Alterations MC 7-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 342
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1149 (SB1013) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1362 Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1454 /CH0477 Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1609 State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1013 (HB1149) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1061 St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:40 PM