Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Transient Merchants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0492
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists - Mobile Barbershops and Beauty Salons - Permit Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0291)
Title
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by Counties
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 (HB0604)
Title
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by Counties
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 /CH0236 (HB0972)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0567 /CH0492 Barbers and Cosmetologists - Mobile Barbershops and Beauty Salons - Permit Requirement Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Economic Matters
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0604 (SB0291) Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by Counties Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236) St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0291 (HB0604) Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by Counties Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0995 /CH0236 (HB0972) St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM
Click to return on the top page