Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transient Merchants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 /CH0572 (SB0116/CH0573)
Title
Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 /CH0574 (SB0483/CH0575)
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527 /CH0370 (SB0290/CH0371)
Title
Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 /CH0666
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666 /CH0397
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival Permit - Retail Off-Site Permit
Sponsor
Economic Matters Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0573 (HB0082/CH0572)
Title
Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290 /CH0371 (HB0527/CH0370)
Title
Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 /CH0575 (HB0084/CH0574)
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 /CH0572 (SB0116/CH0573) Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0084 /CH0574 (SB0483/CH0575) Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Appropriations
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0527 /CH0370 (SB0290/CH0371) Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0551 /CH0666 Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0666 /CH0397 Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival Permit - Retail Off-Site Permit Economic Matters Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0573 (HB0082/CH0572) Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
SB0290 /CH0371 (HB0527/CH0370) Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0483 /CH0575 (HB0084/CH0574) Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM