Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transportation, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0771
Title
Mass Transit Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 /CH0140
Title
Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water Access
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055 /CH0661 (SB1063)
Title
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294
Title
Procurements by Maryland Department of Transportation - Accidental Death and Dismemberment Benefits Required
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Bank
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1325
Title
Transportation - Capital Projects - Life Cycle Cost Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Wood
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353 /CH0201 (SB0188/CH0200)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Participation and Goals and Subgoals
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1508
Title
Montgomery County - Highway Construction and Maintenance - Maryland Route 410 in Takoma Park
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 /CH0200 (HB1353/CH0201)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Participation and Goals and Subgoals
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652
Title
Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit Funding
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0653
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Mass Transit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906
Title
Transportation - Life Cycle Cost Analysis
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit Financing
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1063 (HB1055/CH0661)
Title
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538) Public-Private Partnerships Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB0632 Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - Application Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0771 Mass Transit Trust Fund Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Reassigned to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0797 /CH0140 Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water Access Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1055 /CH0661 (SB1063) Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission Delegate Braveboy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1294 Procurements by Maryland Department of Transportation - Accidental Death and Dismemberment Benefits Required Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1322 Transportation Infrastructure Bank Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1325 Transportation - Capital Projects - Life Cycle Cost Analysis Delegate Wood 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1353 /CH0201 (SB0188/CH0200) Minority Business Enterprises - Participation and Goals and Subgoals Delegate Oaks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1508 Montgomery County - Highway Construction and Maintenance - Maryland Route 410 in Takoma Park Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 /CH0200 (HB1353/CH0201) Minority Business Enterprises - Participation and Goals and Subgoals Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0652 Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit Funding Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0653 Sales and Use Tax - Mass Transit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0906 Transportation - Life Cycle Cost Analysis Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1013 Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit Financing Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1063 (HB1055/CH0661) Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM