Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transportation, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0394
Title
Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 (SB0708)
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0778)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0238
Title
Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 (SB0657)
Title
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0164
Title
Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0381
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 (HB0702)
Title
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0119)
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB0172)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0394 Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0119 (SB0708) Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act) Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0172 (SB0778) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0300 /CH0238 Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0702 (SB0657) State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0370 /CH0164 Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0379 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0381 State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0657 (HB0702) State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0708 (HB0119) Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act) Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0778 (HB0172) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM