Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trapping -see also- Hunting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0088/CH0148)
Title
Natural Resources - Game Birds - Baiting
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0148 (HB0170)
Title
Natural Resources - Game Birds - Baiting
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0170 (SB0088/CH0148) Natural Resources - Game Birds - Baiting Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0876 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0148 (HB0170) Natural Resources - Game Birds - Baiting Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM