Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Treasurers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 /CH0230 (SB0321/CH0229)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470
Title
Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0509
Title
Maryland False Claims Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0558 (SB0814/CH0557)
Title
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 /CH0681
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452
Title
Linked Deposit Program for Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0194
Title
Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 /CH0229 (HB0410/CH0230)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 /CH0557 (HB0720/CH0558)
Title
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 /CH0345
Title
Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0410 /CH0230 (SB0321/CH0229) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0470 Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0509 Maryland False Claims Act of 2013 Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0520 St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538) Public-Private Partnerships Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB0720 /CH0558 (SB0814/CH0557) Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1390 /CH0681 Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - Establishment Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 Linked Deposit Program for Small Businesses Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 /CH0194 Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 /CH0229 (HB0410/CH0230) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005) Public-Private Partnerships President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0814 /CH0557 (HB0720/CH0558) Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1072 /CH0345 Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business Enterprises Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2013 - 10:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM