Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Treasurers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 (SB0236/CH0283)
Title
Constitutional Officers - Salaries
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 (SB0536)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0571 (SB0889/CH0570)
Title
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 /CH0454
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0283 (HB0230)
Title
Constitutional Officers - Salaries
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 (HB0941)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0310
Title
Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 /CH0570 (HB1060/CH0571)
Title
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1043
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0230 (SB0236/CH0283) Constitutional Officers - Salaries Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0867 Maryland False Claims Act Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0941 (SB0536) Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - Establishment Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 /CH0571 (SB0889/CH0570) Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority Delegate James 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 /CH0454 St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1436 Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0236 /CH0283 (HB0230) Constitutional Officers - Salaries President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0536 (HB0941) Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Commission - Establishment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 /CH0310 Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0689 Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0889 /CH0570 (HB1060/CH0571) Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1043 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM