Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Treasurers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0374/CH0165)
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 /CH0097
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Certification for License Application
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0275
Title
Inaugural Committees - Donations and Disbursements - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890
Title
State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 /CH0165 (HB0405)
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683
Title
State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - Established
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0405 (SB0374/CH0165) Maryland False Claims Act Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0589 /CH0097 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Certification for License Application Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 /CH0275 Inaugural Committees - Donations and Disbursements - Disclosure Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0890 State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of Benefits Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
SB0374 /CH0165 (HB0405) Maryland False Claims Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - Established Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM