Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Treasurers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202 /CH0268 (SB0255/CH0267)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 (SB0306)
Title
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 /CH0004 (SB0371/CH0550)
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0296 (SB0395/CH0297)
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682 (SB0298/CH0428)
Title
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 (SB0805)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345 /CH0523
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373 (SB0336)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
Somerset County - Code of Public Local Laws - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 /CH0428 (HB0682)
Title
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 (HB0430)
Title
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB1373)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0550 (HB0503/CH0004)
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0297 (HB0679/CH0296)
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB0882)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0202 /CH0268 (SB0255/CH0267) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 AM
HB0430 (SB0306) Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 /CH0004 (SB0371/CH0550) State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Appropriations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0296 (SB0395/CH0297) St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0682 (SB0298/CH0428) St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0882 (SB0805) Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1345 /CH0523 National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1373 (SB0336) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0039 Somerset County - Code of Public Local Laws - Cross-References and Corrections Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/12/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0298 /CH0428 (HB0682) St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0306 (HB0430) Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 (HB1373) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0550 (HB0503/CH0004) State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 /CH0297 (HB0679/CH0296) St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 (HB0882) Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM