Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238
Title
Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air Navigation
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Local Law, Rule, or Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Harvesting - Public Notice of Process and Licensees
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0747)
Title
Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation Management
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 (SB0154)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal Energy
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832
Title
Natural Resources - Licensed Tree Experts - Insurance and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145 (SB0903)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB0636)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal Energy
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0611)
Title
Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation Management
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB1145)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0238 Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air Navigation Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0376 Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Local Law, Rule, or Regulation Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0513 Natural Resources - Forest Harvesting - Public Notice of Process and Licensees Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0611 (SB0747) Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation Management Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0636 (SB0154) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal Energy Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0832 Natural Resources - Licensed Tree Experts - Insurance and Fees Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1145 (SB0903) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 (HB0636) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal Energy Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0747 (HB0611) Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation Management Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0903 (HB1145) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM