Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0065 /CH0087
Title
Tree Expert License - Application and Renewal - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0614
Title
State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178
Title
Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Local Law, Rule, Regulation, or Other Action
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818
Title
Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Property Damage Caused by Tree
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 (SB0918)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Cylburn Arboretum Carriage House and Nature Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Prince George's County - Forest Conservation Act - Net Tract Area PG/MC 114-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596
Title
Transportation - Installation of Brick Security Mailboxes Within Rights-of-Way
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB0942)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Cylburn Arboretum Carriage House and Nature Museum
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0065 /CH0087 Tree Expert License - Application and Renewal - Repeal of Sunset Provision Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0132 /CH0614 State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0178 Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0435 Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Local Law, Rule, Regulation, or Other Action Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0818 Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Property Damage Caused by Tree Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0942 (SB0918) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Cylburn Arboretum Carriage House and Nature Museum Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
HB1197 Prince George's County - Forest Conservation Act - Net Tract Area PG/MC 114-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0596 Transportation - Installation of Brick Security Mailboxes Within Rights-of-Way Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0918 (HB0942) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Cylburn Arboretum Carriage House and Nature Museum Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM