Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272 /CH0601 (SB0234/CH0602)
Title
Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0729/CH0405)
Title
Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0602 (HB0272/CH0601)
Title
Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 /CH0405 (HB0735)
Title
Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 /CH0601 (SB0234/CH0602) Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0735 (SB0729/CH0405) Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland Delegate Healey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0234 /CH0602 (HB0272/CH0601) Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0729 /CH0405 (HB0735) Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM