Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0168)
Title
Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 /CH0304 (SB0597/CH0305)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155
Title
Local Governments - Responsibility for Repairing or Replacing Sidewalks
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311 /CH0456 (SB0867)
Title
Natural Resources – Tree Expert License – Eligibility Criteria
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0926)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 (HB0098)
Title
Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300 (HB0229)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351
Title
Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 /CH0305 (HB0687/CH0304)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 (HB1311/CH0456)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Definition of "Tree Expert" - Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB1425)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0098 (SB0168) Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0687 /CH0304 (SB0597/CH0305) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 304
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1155 Local Governments - Responsibility for Repairing or Replacing Sidewalks Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1311 /CH0456 (SB0867) Natural Resources – Tree Expert License – Eligibility Criteria Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 456
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1425 (SB0926) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0168 (HB0098) Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0300 (HB0229) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0351 Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act) Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0597 /CH0305 (HB0687/CH0304) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 305
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0867 (HB1311/CH0456) Allegany County and Garrett County - Definition of "Tree Expert" - Alteration Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0926 (HB1425) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:47 PM