Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trespass

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Senator Gladden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM