Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trespass

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Trespass to a Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287 /CH0235 (SB0808)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 (HB0287/CH0235)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB0128 Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Trespass to a Vehicle Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0227 Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0287 /CH0235 (SB0808) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0373 Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0808 (HB0287/CH0235) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM