Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trespass

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0100
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Trespass to a Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252
Title
Protection of Persons and Property - Criminal Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 /CH0664 (SB0266/CH0663)
Title
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799 /CH0278
Title
Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149
Title
Juvenile Law - Citations for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 /CH0663 (HB0410/CH0664)
Title
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0100 Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Trespass to a Vehicle Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0198 Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0252 Protection of Persons and Property - Criminal Immunity Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0410 /CH0664 (SB0266/CH0663) Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016 Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0799 /CH0278 Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0149 Juvenile Law - Citations for Violations Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0266 /CH0663 (HB0410/CH0664) Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016 Senator Salling 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM