Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trespass

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0615)
Title
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927
Title
Criminal Law - Trespass, Petty Theft, and Disturbing the Peace - Alteration of Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1497
Title
Video Lottery Operations - Persons on Voluntary Exclusion List - Trespass
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0849)
Title
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0849 (SB0615) Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0927 Criminal Law - Trespass, Petty Theft, and Disturbing the Peace - Alteration of Penalties Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1497 Video Lottery Operations - Persons on Voluntary Exclusion List - Trespass Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 (HB0849) Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM