Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 (SB0316)
Title
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (The Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 (SB0940)
Title
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 (SB0574)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393 (SB0675)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409
Title
Courts - Law Enforcement Officer as Witness - Prohibition on Postponement for Inability to Appear
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411 (SB0677)
Title
DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0316 (HB0369)
Title
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (The Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2017)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501
Title
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by Jury
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0428)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB1393)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 (HB1411)
Title
DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836
Title
Civil Actions - Punitive Damage Awards
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 (HB0377)
Title
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946
Title
Gun-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0369 (SB0316) Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (The Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2017) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0377 (SB0940) Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0428 (SB0574) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0881 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1393 (SB0675) Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial Convictions Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1409 Courts - Law Enforcement Officer as Witness - Prohibition on Postponement for Inability to Appear Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1411 (SB0677) DNA Testing - Postconviction Review Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0316 (HB0369) Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (The Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2017) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by Jury Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0428) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 (HB1393) Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial Convictions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 (HB1411) DNA Testing - Postconviction Review Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 Civil Actions - Punitive Damage Awards Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 (HB0377) Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0946 Gun-Free Higher Education Zones Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM