Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 /CH0188 (SB0233/CH0189)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 /CH0362 (SB0270/CH0363)
Title
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 (SB0298)
Title
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0423/CH0602)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 (SB0551)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125
Title
Evidence - Chain of Custody - DNA Profile
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411 (SB0346)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005
Title
Civil Actions - Punitive Damage Awards
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0550
Title
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer and Distress Actions - Trial by Jury
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 /CH0189 (HB0111/CH0188)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0363 (HB0301/CH0362)
Title
Courts – Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 (HB0353)
Title
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 (HB1411)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423 /CH0602 (HB0395)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0749)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0010
Title
Postconviction Review – Convictions Resulting From Pleas
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0111 /CH0188 (SB0233/CH0189) Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0301 /CH0362 (SB0270/CH0363) Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0353 (SB0298) Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0395 (SB0423/CH0602) Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Judiciary
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0618 Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 (SB0551) Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1125 Evidence - Chain of Custody - DNA Profile Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1151 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1411 (SB0346) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 PM
Judiciary
SB0005 Civil Actions - Punitive Damage Awards Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0226 /CH0550 Real Property - Wrongful Detainer and Distress Actions - Trial by Jury Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 /CH0189 (HB0111/CH0188) Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 /CH0363 (HB0301/CH0362) Courts – Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018) Senator Brochin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0298 (HB0353) Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0346 (HB1411) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0423 /CH0602 (HB0395) Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0551 (HB0749) Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SJ0010 Postconviction Review – Convictions Resulting From Pleas Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM