Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tri-County Council

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394
Title
Economic Development - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Reorganization
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0470 (SB0137/CH0469)
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0469 (HB1024/CH0470)
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0394 Economic Development - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Reorganization Delegate Bohanan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1024 /CH0470 (SB0137/CH0469) Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0137 /CH0469 (HB1024/CH0470) Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM