Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Truancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0282/CH0152)
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB1061)
Title
Truant Students - System of Active Intervention - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0715)
Title
Task Force to Study Chronic Absenteeism in Maryland's Public Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903
Title
Baltimore County - Truancy Education Pilot Program - Parents and Guardians of Students
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0152 (HB0242)
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB0869)
Title
Task Force to Study Chronic Absenteeism in Maryland's Public Schools
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All Counties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061 (HB0363)
Title
Truant Students - System of Active Intervention - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 (SB0282/CH0152) Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0363 (SB1061) Truant Students - System of Active Intervention - Requirements Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 (SB0715) Task Force to Study Chronic Absenteeism in Maryland's Public Schools Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0903 Baltimore County - Truancy Education Pilot Program - Parents and Guardians of Students Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0282 /CH0152 (HB0242) Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0715 (HB0869) Task Force to Study Chronic Absenteeism in Maryland's Public Schools Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1038 Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All Counties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
SB1061 (HB0363) Truant Students - System of Active Intervention - Requirements Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM