Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Truancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 /CH0249
Title
Baltimore County - Education - WhyTry Program
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429 /CH0266
Title
Task Force to Combat Habitual Student Truancy
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 /CH0672 (SB0422/CH0671)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 /CH0300
Title
Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and Support
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 /CH0671 (HB0709/CH0672)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 /CH0249 Baltimore County - Education - WhyTry Program Delegate Cluster 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0429 /CH0266 Task Force to Combat Habitual Student Truancy Delegate Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/09/2016 - 12:30 PM
HB0709 /CH0672 (SB0422/CH0671) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 /CH0300 Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and Support Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 /CH0671 (HB0709/CH0672) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM