Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Truancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 /CH0706 (SB0160/CH0707)
Title
Juvenile Law – Truancy
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1464
Title
Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507
Title
Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0707 (HB0319/CH0706)
Title
Juvenile Law – Truancy
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0319 /CH0706 (SB0160/CH0707) Juvenile Law – Truancy Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 706
Judiciary
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1464 Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1507 Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0160 /CH0707 (HB0319/CH0706) Juvenile Law – Truancy Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 707
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM