Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Truancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 (SB0275)
Title
Education - Community and Local Accountability for Struggling Schools (CLASS) Act of 2020 - Innovation Schools
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724
Title
Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB0662)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB0791)
Title
County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0347)
Title
Education - Community and Local Accountability for Struggling Schools (CLASS) Act of 2020 - Innovation Schools
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 (HB0986)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1298)
Title
County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0347 (SB0275) Education - Community and Local Accountability for Struggling Schools (CLASS) Act of 2020 - Innovation Schools Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0986 (SB0662) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1298 (SB0791) County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0275 (HB0347) Education - Community and Local Accountability for Struggling Schools (CLASS) Act of 2020 - Innovation Schools President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 (HB0986) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0791 (HB1298) County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2020 1:15 PM