Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0436 /CH0406 (SB0003)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Tow Truck
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678
Title
Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 /CH0450 (SB0771)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 (HB0436/CH0406)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Tow Truck
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0014
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB1246/CH0450)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0436 /CH0406 (SB0003) Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Tow Truck Delegate Rudolph 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0678 Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 /CH0450 (SB0771) Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0003 (HB0436/CH0406) Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Tow Truck Senator Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0014 Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 (HB1246/CH0450) Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment Senator Robey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM