Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 /CH0608
Title
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179
Title
Vehicle Laws - Chesapeake Bay Commemorative Registration Plates - Truck Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392 (SB0274)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Trade-Ins and Core Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698 (SB0573)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and Pollinators
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473
Title
Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0392)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292
Title
Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for Refund
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 (HB0698)
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 /CH0608 Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and Inspections Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0179 Vehicle Laws - Chesapeake Bay Commemorative Registration Plates - Truck Eligibility Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0392 (SB0274) Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0486 Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0540 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Trade-Ins and Core Charges Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 (SB0573) Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1102 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and Pollinators Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1473 Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0392) Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement Officers Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0292 Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for Refund Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 (HB0698) Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM