Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343
Title
Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 /CH0748
Title
Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930 (SB0640)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0077 (SB0558/CH0076)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 (SB1050)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 /CH0076 (HB1035/CH0077)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0930)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 /CH0353 (HB0768)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050 (HB1479)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight Limits
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0343 Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration Plate Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0889 /CH0748 Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 (SB0640) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1035 /CH0077 (SB0558/CH0076) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1479 (SB1050) Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight Limits Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 /CH0076 (HB1035/CH0077) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0930) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 /CH0353 (HB0768) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1050 (HB1479) Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight Limits Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM