Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 /CH0544 (SB0445/CH0545)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1462 (SB0701)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543
Title
Tow Trucks – Driver Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1738
Title
Motor Vehicles – Large Vehicles – Left Lane Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 /CH0545 (HB0531/CH0544)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 (HB1462)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0531 /CH0544 (SB0445/CH0545) Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1174 Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood Dealers Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1462 (SB0701) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1543 Tow Trucks – Driver Safety Act Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1738 Motor Vehicles – Large Vehicles – Left Lane Prohibition Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0445 /CH0545 (HB0531/CH0544) Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0701 (HB1462) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM