Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429
Title
Tow Trucks - Driver Safety Act
Sponsor
Environment and Transportation Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0509 (SB0157)
Title
Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401 /CH0254
Title
Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1422
Title
Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0139
Title
Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157 (HB0509)
Title
Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0126
Title
Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0429 Tow Trucks - Driver Safety Act Environment and Transportation Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0509 (SB0157) Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1401 /CH0254 Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1422 Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 /CH0139 Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0157 (HB0509) Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/07/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0592 /CH0126 Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM