Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Trucks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0086
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses - Following Too Closely - Application to Trucks
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875
Title
Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142 /CH0433
Title
Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240
Title
Motor Vehicles - Registration - Class E (Truck) "Dump Service Registration" Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543 (SB0912)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1627
Title
Motor Vehicles - Large Vehicles - Left Lane Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 /CH0504 (HB0050)
Title
Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB1543)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0158 /CH0086 Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0174 Motor Vehicle Offenses - Following Too Closely - Application to Trucks Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0875 Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1142 /CH0433 Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 Motor Vehicles - Registration - Class E (Truck) "Dump Service Registration" Vehicles Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1492 Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1505 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1543 (SB0912) Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1627 Motor Vehicles - Large Vehicles - Left Lane Prohibition Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0041 /CH0504 (HB0050) Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0912 (HB1543) Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:43 PM