Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tuition

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 /CH0270 (SB0074/CH0269)
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 /CH0600 (SB0455)
Title
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Tuition Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Tuition Reduction for Unemployed Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 (SB0626)
Title
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884
Title
Income Tax Credit - Nonpublic Education Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998 (SB0647)
Title
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262 (SB0633)
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 /CH0451
Title
Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432 /CH0543 (SB0666/CH0542)
Title
Teaching Fellows for Maryland Scholarship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1504
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018
Title
Higher Education - Military Dependents - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Higher Education - Military Dependents - Nonresident Tuition Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0269 (HB0018/CH0270)
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 (HB0482/CH0600)
Title
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Tuition Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463
Title
Community Colleges - Developmental Education Courses - Student Credit Hours
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610 /CH0183
Title
National Guard - Tuition Assistance - Members of Disbanded Units
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB0853)
Title
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - Studies
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 (HB1262)
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647 (HB0998)
Title
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 /CH0542 (HB1432/CH0543)
Title
Teaching Fellows for Maryland Scholarship Program
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801
Title
Teach It Forward Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 /CH0270 (SB0074/CH0269) Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Appropriations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0482 /CH0600 (SB0455) Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Tuition Exemption Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0484 Higher Education - Community Colleges - Tuition Reduction for Unemployed Individuals Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0853 (SB0626) University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - Studies Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0884 Income Tax Credit - Nonpublic Education Expenses Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0998 (SB0647) Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1262 (SB0633) Maryland Education Credit Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 /CH0451 Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of Benefits Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1432 /CH0543 (SB0666/CH0542) Teaching Fellows for Maryland Scholarship Program Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1504 Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2014 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 Higher Education - Military Dependents - In-State Tuition Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 Higher Education - Military Dependents - Nonresident Tuition Exemption Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 /CH0269 (HB0018/CH0270) Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0455 (HB0482/CH0600) Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Tuition Exemption Senator Reilly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 Community Colleges - Developmental Education Courses - Student Credit Hours Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0610 /CH0183 National Guard - Tuition Assistance - Members of Disbanded Units Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 (HB0853) University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - Studies Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0633 (HB1262) Maryland Education Credit Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0647 (HB0998) Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0666 /CH0542 (HB1432/CH0543) Teaching Fellows for Maryland Scholarship Program Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 Teach It Forward Act of 2014 Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM