Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tuition

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118 /CH0581
Title
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262 (SB0537)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268 (SB0240/CH0464)
Title
Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Residency Requirement - Determination of In-State Tuition Status
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804
Title
Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Certification and Licensure Courses at Community Colleges - Use of Scholarship
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Maryland National Guard - Tuition Assistance Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0191)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250 (SB0588)
Title
Career Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0147
Title
Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 (HB1184)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 /CH0464 (HB0268)
Title
Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260 /CH0752
Title
Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0262)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 (HB1250)
Title
Career Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028
Title
Rural Health Care Scholarship and Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0118 /CH0581 Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Appropriations
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0262 (SB0537) Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0268 (SB0240/CH0464) Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0318 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Residency Requirement - Determination of In-State Tuition Status Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0804 Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Certification and Licensure Courses at Community Colleges - Use of Scholarship Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 Maryland National Guard - Tuition Assistance Program - Modifications Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0191) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1250 (SB0588) Career Education Act of 2019 Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0074 /CH0147 Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2019 - 3:30 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0191 (HB1184) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0240 /CH0464 (HB0268) Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0260 /CH0752 Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0537 (HB0262) Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 (HB1250) Career Education Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB1028 Rural Health Care Scholarship and Grant Program - Established Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM