Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unemployment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0787)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Tuition Reduction for Unemployed Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 /CH0613
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Unemployment Insurance Contribution Fluctuations on Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Income Tax Credit - Hiring Qualified Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169
Title
Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up Business
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1417 /CH0251
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0473)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0473 (SB0787) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0484 Higher Education - Community Colleges - Tuition Reduction for Unemployed Individuals Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0765 /CH0613 State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 Task Force to Study the Impact of Unemployment Insurance Contribution Fluctuations on Small Businesses Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Income Tax Credit - Hiring Qualified Veterans Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up Business Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014 Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1417 /CH0251 Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 (HB0473) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM