Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unemployment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0250
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Electronic Transmission of Information and Documents - Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0245 (SB0021/CH0244)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141 /CH0248 (SB0017/CH0249)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282
Title
Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1642 (SB1169/CH0733)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural Disaster
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 /CH0249 (HB0141/CH0248)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 /CH0244 (HB0137/CH0245)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0262
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Youth Sports Workers
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment for Nail Technicians - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1169 /CH0733 (HB1642)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural Disaster
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1192
Title
Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Independent Contractors and Severance Pay
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 /CH0250 Unemployment Insurance - Electronic Transmission of Information and Documents - Authority Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0137 /CH0245 (SB0021/CH0244) Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0141 /CH0248 (SB0017/CH0249) Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0282 Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - Expansion Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1642 (SB1169/CH0733) Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural Disaster Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0017 /CH0249 (HB0141/CH0248) Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0021 /CH0244 (HB0137/CH0245) Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0070 /CH0262 Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Youth Sports Workers Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0417 Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment for Nail Technicians - Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1169 /CH0733 (HB1642) Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural Disaster Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1192 Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Independent Contractors and Severance Pay Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM