Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unemployment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336 /CH0001 (SB0391/CH0002)
Title
Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 (SB0444)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073 (SB0616)
Title
Joint Committee on Workforce Development
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 (SB0493)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Contribution and Employment Reports - Required Information (Workforce Data Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318 (SB0512/CH0522)
Title
Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011 /CH0082
Title
Distressed Counties - References and Definitions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 /CH0002 (HB0336/CH0001)
Title
Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 (HB0453)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB1128)
Title
Workforce Data Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616 (HB1073)
Title
Joint Committee on Workforce Development
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0336 /CH0001 (SB0391/CH0002) Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Economic Matters
1/31/2019 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0453 (SB0444) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1073 (SB0616) Joint Committee on Workforce Development Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Economic Matters
HB1128 (SB0493) Unemployment Insurance - Contribution and Employment Reports - Required Information (Workforce Data Act of 2019) Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 (SB0512/CH0522) Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
SB0011 /CH0082 Distressed Counties - References and Definitions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0391 /CH0002 (HB0336/CH0001) Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0444 (HB0453) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Bulk Vending Item Assembly Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0493 (HB1128) Workforce Data Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0616 (HB1073) Joint Committee on Workforce Development Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM