Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 /CH0350
Title
Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - Scope
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0465 (SB0383/CH0464)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 (SB0374/CH0246)
Title
Consumer Protection - Children's Online Privacy Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 (SB0185)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0316)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878
Title
Consumer Protection - Store Credit Cards for Rebates and Returned Merchandise - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Turner, V.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212 (SB0709)
Title
Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 /CH0408
Title
Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Consumer Protection - Payment by Credit Card - Prohibition of Surcharge
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1469
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Goods Offered at a Sale Price - Rain Checks
Sponsor
Delegate Turner, F.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116
Title
Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0332)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 /CH0246 (HB0316)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Workgroup on Children's Online Privacy Protection
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 /CH0464 (HB0291/CH0465)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB1212)
Title
Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0126 /CH0350 Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - Scope Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Economic Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0291 /CH0465 (SB0383/CH0464) Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0316 (SB0374/CH0246) Consumer Protection - Children's Online Privacy Protection Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0332 (SB0185) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0432 (SB0316) Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0878 Consumer Protection - Store Credit Cards for Rebates and Returned Merchandise - Required Notice Delegate Turner, V. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 (SB0709) Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - Restrictions Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 /CH0408 Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - Study Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1218 Consumer Protection - Payment by Credit Card - Prohibition of Surcharge Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1469 Consumer Protection - Consumer Goods Offered at a Sale Price - Rain Checks Delegate Turner, F. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0116 Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0185 (HB0332) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 /CH0246 (HB0316) Office of the Attorney General - Workgroup on Children's Online Privacy Protection Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0376 Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0383 /CH0464 (HB0291/CH0465) Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0709 (HB1212) Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - Restrictions Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM