Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0154/CH0042)
Title
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 (SB0776)
Title
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652
Title
Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704 /CH0277 (SB0160/CH0276)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788
Title
Mobile Phone Companies - Third-Party Vendor Billing - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 (SB0950)
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 /CH0025
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing Rules
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0042 (HB0098)
Title
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0276 (HB0704/CH0277)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB0244)
Title
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950 (HB0924)
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0098 (SB0154/CH0042) Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition Delegate Arora 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0244 (SB0776) Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0652 Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - Restrictions Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0676 Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0704 /CH0277 (SB0160/CH0276) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0788 Mobile Phone Companies - Third-Party Vendor Billing - Restrictions Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care Services Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0924 (SB0950) Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0098 /CH0025 Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing Rules Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 /CH0042 (HB0098) Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Finance
1/22/2014 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0160 /CH0276 (HB0704/CH0277) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0776 (HB0244) Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0950 (HB0924) Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM