Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111
Title
Business Regulation - Sales of Dogs and Cats - Required Health Certificate
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 /CH0096
Title
Commercial Law - Nondisparagement Clauses in Consumer Contracts - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 (SB0201)
Title
Environment - Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 /CH0485
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529
Title
Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0734/CH0722)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0494 (SB0414)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0666)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Environment - Mattress Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 /CH0134
Title
Gas and Electric Companies - Retail Choice Customer Education and Protection Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 (HB0332)
Title
Environment - Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334
Title
Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0675/CH0494)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0982)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 /CH0722 (HB0535/CH0721)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976
Title
Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0111 Business Regulation - Sales of Dogs and Cats - Required Health Certificate Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0131 /CH0096 Commercial Law - Nondisparagement Clauses in Consumer Contracts - Prohibition Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0332 (SB0201) Environment - Paint Stewardship Program Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0439 /CH0485 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0734/CH0722) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0675 /CH0494 (SB0414) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0982 (SB0666) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Economic Matters
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Environment - Mattress Stewardship Program Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1144 /CH0134 Gas and Electric Companies - Retail Choice Customer Education and Protection Fund Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0201 (HB0332) Environment - Paint Stewardship Program Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0334 Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 (HB0675/CH0494) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0666 (HB0982) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0734 /CH0722 (HB0535/CH0721) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0976 Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and Regulation Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM