Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0237
Title
Community Colleges - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 (SB0837)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080
Title
Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 /CH0515
Title
Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Contracts Renewal - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1655
Title
Commercial Law - Privacy and Net Neutrality Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1759
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 /CH0826 (HB0740/CH0825)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB0635)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0237 Community Colleges - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0635 (SB0837) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1080 Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 /CH0515 Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018 Delegate Afzali 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 Consumer Protection - Consumer Contracts Renewal - Restrictions Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1655 Commercial Law - Privacy and Net Neutrality Protections Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1759 Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0693 /CH0826 (HB0740/CH0825) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB0635) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM