Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0650
Title
Civil Actions - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices by Mortgage Servicer - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746 (SB0873)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 (SB0709)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538
Title
Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB1415)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0746)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0425 /CH0650 Civil Actions - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices by Mortgage Servicer - Statute of Limitations Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Judiciary
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0746 (SB0873) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 (SB0709) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0490 Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices President 6 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0709 (HB1415) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0873 (HB0746) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM