Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unfair Trade Practices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 /CH0160
Title
Consumer Protection - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 /CH0470 (SB0875)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies and Bill Collections
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478 (SB0913)
Title
Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1562
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1663 /CH0014 (SB1080/CH0013)
Title
State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB1478)
Title
Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1080 /CH0013 (HB1663/CH0014)
Title
State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0249 Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0304 /CH0160 Consumer Protection - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Shetty 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 160
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 /CH0470 (SB0875) Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies and Bill Collections Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1478 (SB0913) Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1562 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1663 /CH0014 (SB1080/CH0013) State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020) Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0913 (HB1478) Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1080 /CH0013 (HB1663/CH0014) State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020) President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:42 PM