Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Uniform Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0789)
Title
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB0412)
Title
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2017 - 3:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0412 (SB0789) Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6 Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 (HB0412) Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM