Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145
Title
Public School Labor Relations Board - Renegotiation Procedures and Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 (SB0993)
Title
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 /CH0037 (SB0378/CH0023)
Title
State Employees - Merit Increases in Salary
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 (SB0618)
Title
Higher Education - Employee Rights - Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower Law
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 /CH0023 (HB0454/CH0037)
Title
State Employees - Merit Increases in Salary
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0618 (HB0813)
Title
Higher Education - Employee Rights - Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower Law
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Election and Certification of Exclusive Representatives
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Baltimore City - Demolition Program Funding
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB0343)
Title
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0145 Public School Labor Relations Board - Renegotiation Procedures and Administration Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0343 (SB0993) Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - Requirement Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0454 /CH0037 (SB0378/CH0023) State Employees - Merit Increases in Salary Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0736 Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0795 Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0813 (SB0618) Higher Education - Employee Rights - Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower Law Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1038 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0363 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 /CH0023 (HB0454/CH0037) State Employees - Merit Increases in Salary President 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0618 (HB0813) Higher Education - Employee Rights - Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower Law Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0690 State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Election and Certification of Exclusive Representatives Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Baltimore City - Demolition Program Funding Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0993 (HB0343) Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - Requirement Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM