Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0607 (SB0636)
Title
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 (SB0408)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105
Title
Job-Related Alcohol and Controlled Dangerous Substances Testing - Medical Review Officers and Preliminary Breath Tests
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0667)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 (HB0284/CH0607)
Title
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 /CH0029 (HB0811/CH0022)
Title
Education – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative’s Access to New Employee Processing
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888
Title
Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0264 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0284 /CH0607 (SB0636) Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 (SB0408) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1105 Job-Related Alcohol and Controlled Dangerous Substances Testing - Medical Review Officers and Preliminary Breath Tests Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0408 (HB0667) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0636 (HB0284/CH0607) Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining Cecil County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 /CH0029 (HB0811/CH0022) Education – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative’s Access to New Employee Processing Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0888 Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:58 PM