Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0549)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251
Title
Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280 /CH0563
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 /CH0016 (SB1040)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 /CH0100
Title
Insurance Regulation - Third Party Administrators - Life Insurance
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 (HB0111)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0111 (SB0549) Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0126 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1251 Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1280 /CH0563 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1407 /CH0016 (SB1040) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019 Chair, Appropriations Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0022 /CH0100 Insurance Regulation - Third Party Administrators - Life Insurance Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0549 (HB0111) Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM