Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Urban Areas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277 (SB0367)
Title
State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 (SB0990)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Clean Energy and Energy Efficiency - Investment in Disadvantaged Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0926)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1534
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226
Title
Highways – Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways – Modification
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367 (HB0277)
Title
State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 (HB0345)
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB1425)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990 (HB0464)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0277 (SB0367) State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0464 (SB0990) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0890 Maryland Paint Stewardship Program Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1126 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1206 Clean Energy and Energy Efficiency - Investment in Disadvantaged Communities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 (SB0926) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1534 Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0226 Highways – Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways – Modification Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0367 (HB0277) State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0431 (HB0345) Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0926 (HB1425) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0990 (HB0464) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:41 PM