Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Urban Areas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080 (SB0359)
Title
Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0673)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0279)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 /CH0095
Title
Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Repeal of Repayment Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0414)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Public Guardianship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944 (SB0711)
Title
Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991
Title
Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047
Title
Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development – Partnership Rental Housing Program – Alterations (Mixed–Income Housing Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Tree Planting – Urban Trees Program and Commission for the Innovation and Advancement of Carbon Markets and Sustainable Tree Plantings
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207 (SB0674)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 (HB0396)
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 (HB0548)
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 (HB0080)
Title
Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 /CH0091
Title
Neighborhood Business Development Program - Food Desert Projects - Business Retention
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0583)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631
Title
Workgroup to Study and Implement a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 (HB0269)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 (HB1207)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711 (HB0944)
Title
Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869
Title
Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0080 (SB0359) Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0269 (SB0673) Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0396 (SB0279) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0487 Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0497 /CH0095 Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Repeal of Repayment Requirement Delegate Boyce 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0583 (SB0414) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0903 Task Force to Study the Maryland Public Guardianship Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0944 (SB0711) Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0991 Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1047 Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 Department of Housing and Community Development – Partnership Rental Housing Program – Alterations (Mixed–Income Housing Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1133 Tree Planting – Urban Trees Program and Commission for the Innovation and Advancement of Carbon Markets and Sustainable Tree Plantings Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1207 (SB0674) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0279 (HB0396) Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0299 (HB0548) Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0359 (HB0080) Department of Transportation - Urban Tree Program - Establishment Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0365 /CH0091 Neighborhood Business Development Program - Food Desert Projects - Business Retention Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0414 (HB0583) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0631 Workgroup to Study and Implement a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0673 (HB0269) Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0674 (HB1207) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0711 (HB0944) Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB0869 Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page