Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Urban Renewal -see also- Commercial Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 /CH0082
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program - Project Proposals
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203
Title
Economic Development - Arts, Business, and Cultural District - Pennsylvania Avenue Corridor in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864
Title
Real Property - Eminent Domain - Limitations on Condemnation Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020 /CH0143
Title
Baltimore City - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143
Title
Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 /CH0082 Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program - Project Proposals Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0203 Economic Development - Arts, Business, and Cultural District - Pennsylvania Avenue Corridor in Baltimore City Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0864 Real Property - Eminent Domain - Limitations on Condemnation Authority Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1020 /CH0143 Baltimore City - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Ways and Means
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1143 Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation Commission Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM